Sazerac Company, Inc. v. Fetzer Vineyards
Plaintiff: Sazerac Company, Inc.
Defendant: Fetzer Vineyards
Case Number: 3:2015cv04618
Filed: October 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER DENYING 168 MOTION TO STAY EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT PENDING APPEAL WITHOUT SUPERSEDEAS BOND by Judge William H. Orrick. Sazerac's request to stay the judgment pending appeal is granted, but its bid to waive the bond requirement is DENIED. It is required to post a bond in the amount of $622,581.28. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER ON FETZER'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES by Judge William H. Orrick granting in part and denying in part 150 Motion for Attorney Fees. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/19/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER ON FETZER'S 63 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2017)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 68 STIPULATION to continue briefing deadlines re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Response due by 3/6/2017. Reply due by 3/20/2017. Hearing rescheduled for April 4, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/02/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2017) Modified on 3/2/2017 to correct hearing date (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 40 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/13/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/11/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING re 13 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Fetzer Vineyards. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/29/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sazerac Company, Inc. v. Fetzer Vineyards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sazerac Company, Inc.
Represented By: Vincent J. Badolato
Represented By: Thomas Michael David Hadid
Represented By: Peter Joel Willsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fetzer Vineyards
Represented By: Eric J. Ball
Represented By: Annasara Guzzo Purcell
Represented By: Jedediah Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?