Fong et al v. Volkswagen AG et al
Plaintiff: Rosalie Fedoruk, Christiane Hipps, Rene Henery, Laura Peck, Judith Bosl, Mangalpal Takhar, Jennifer Kline, Sarah Burt, Jason Butler, Gregory M Sirota, Stephen Y Fong, Josh Chisom, William Bosl, George Torgun, Mark Rovner, John Balmes, Matthew Markovich, Ruth Shapiro, Connor McDonald, Timothy Shaw and Maureen Katz
Defendant: Volkswagen AG and Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv04626
Filed: October 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 MDL MEMBER CASE CLOSED: MDL 2672, Pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal in the MDL 15-md-2672 CRB master file (dkt. #7479), civil case no. 3:15-cv-4626 CRB is terminated. cc: JPMDL (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
November 7, 2016 Filing 25 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/03/2016, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, rhondaaquilina@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (2151 in 3:15-md-02672-CRB) Transcript Order, (2146 in 3:15-md-02672-CRB) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2017. (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
March 24, 2016 Filing 24 Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/24/16, before Judge Breyer. Court Reporter Pamela A. Batalo, telephone number 626-688-7509;pamela_batalo@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (1382 in 3:15-md-02672-CRB) Transcript Order, (1366 in 3:15-md-02672-CRB) Transcript Order, (1380 in 3:15-md-02672-CRB) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 4/14/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2016. (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 3/24/2016)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 7: Order Appointing Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel, Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, and Government Coordinating Counsel. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on January 21, 2016. (crblc4S COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PRETRIAL ORDER No. 1 -- Case Management Conference set for 12/22/2015 at 8:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/9/2015. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton no longer assigned to the case.Signed by Hon. Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/16/15. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
November 24, 2015 Filing 20 Application for Refund re #1 Complaint,,,, Receipt Number 0971-9894236 by John Balmes, Judith Bosl, William Bosl, Sarah Burt, Jason Butler, Josh Chisom, Rosalie Fedoruk, Stephen Y Fong, Rene Henery, Christiane Hipps, Maureen Katz, Jennifer Kline, Matthew Markovich, Connor McDonald, Laura Peck, Mark Rovner, Ruth Shapiro, Timothy Shaw, Gregory M Sirota, Mangalpal Takhar, George Torgun. (Lee, Jack) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
November 24, 2015 Filing 19 Refund Application declined as to Plaintiffs. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER staying cases. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/24/2015. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
November 20, 2015 Case Reassigned to Judge Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/18/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
November 19, 2015 Filing 16 Application for Refund re #2 Proposed Summons, #1 Complaint,,, #3 Exhibits,, Receipt Number 0971-9894340 by John Balmes, Judith Bosl, William Bosl, Sarah Burt, Jason Butler, Josh Chisom, Rosalie Fedoruk, Stephen Y Fong, Rene Henery, Christiane Hipps, Maureen Katz, Jennifer Kline, Matthew Markovich, Connor McDonald, Laura Peck, Mark Rovner, Ruth Shapiro, Timothy Shaw, Gregory M Sirota, Mangalpal Takhar, George Torgun. (Lee, Jack) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
November 10, 2015 Filing 15 NOTICE by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings (Local Rule 3-13) (Marmolejo, Matthew) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 4, 2015 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Volkswagen AG for Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Marmolejo, Matthew) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
November 4, 2015 Filing 13 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,,, to Extend Time to Respond filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Marmolejo, Matthew) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/5/2016. Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/28/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/27/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2015)
October 27, 2015 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2015)
October 26, 2015 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John Balmes, Judith Bosl, William Bosl, Sarah Burt, Jason Butler, Josh Chisom, Rosalie Fedoruk, Stephen Y Fong, Rene Henery, Christiane Hipps, Maureen Katz, Jennifer Kline, Matthew Markovich, Connor McDonald, Laura Peck, Mark Rovner, Ruth Shapiro, Timothy Shaw, Gregory M Sirota, Mangalpal Takhar, George Torgun.. (Lee, Jack) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
October 26, 2015 Filing 8 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
October 14, 2015 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Balmes, Judith Bosl, William Bosl, Sarah Burt, Jason Butler, Josh Chisom, Rosalie Fedoruk, Stephen Y Fong, Rene Henery, Christiane Hipps, Maureen Katz, Jennifer Kline, Matthew Markovich, Connor McDonald, Laura Peck, Mark Rovner, Ruth Shapiro, Timothy Shaw, Gregory M Sirota, Mangalpal Takhar, George Torgun re #2 Proposed Summons, #1 Complaint,,, 4 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #6 Summons Issued, #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #3 Exhibits, as to Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Lee, Jack) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 7, 2015 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/31/2015. Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2016 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/6/15. (Attachments: #1 JSC Standing Order, #2 Standing Order)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
October 7, 2015 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
October 6, 2015 Filing 3 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint,, Exhibit A (Part 2) filed byJohn Balmes, Judith Bosl, William Bosl, Sarah Burt, Jason Butler, Josh Chisom, Rosalie Fedoruk, Stephen Y Fong, Rene Henery, Christiane Hipps, Maureen Katz, Jennifer Kline, Matthew Markovich, Connor McDonald, Laura Peck, Mark Rovner, Ruth Shapiro, Timothy Shaw, Gregory M Sirota, Mangalpal Takhar, George Torgun. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 2) to Complaint)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Lee, Jack) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
October 6, 2015 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Lee, Jack) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
October 6, 2015 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR: VIOLATIONS OF FEDERAL AND STATE LAW; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9894340.). Filed byChristiane Hipps, Rosalie Fedoruk, Sarah Burt, Mangalpal Takhar, Ruth Shapiro, Stephen Y Fong, Gregory M Sirota, Laura Peck, Jennifer Kline, George Torgun, John Balmes, Josh Chisom, Maureen Katz, Matthew Markovich, Connor McDonald, Mark Rovner, Jason Butler, William Bosl, Timothy Shaw, Rene Henery, Judith Bosl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1), #2 Exhibit A (Part 2)See docket number #3 for Part 2 of Exhibit A, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lee, Jack) (Filed on 10/6/2015) Modified on 10/7/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/7/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fong et al v. Volkswagen AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalie Fedoruk
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Represented By: Lisa P Mak
Represented By: David Mendall McClain
Represented By: Denise Abrams
Represented By: Aron K. Liang
Represented By: Henry Anthony Steinberg
Represented By: Sean Tamura-Sato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christiane Hipps
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Represented By: Lisa P Mak
Represented By: David Mendall McClain
Represented By: Denise Abrams
Represented By: Aron K. Liang
Represented By: Henry Anthony Steinberg
Represented By: Sean Tamura-Sato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene Henery
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Represented By: Lisa P Mak
Represented By: David Mendall McClain
Represented By: Denise Abrams
Represented By: Aron K. Liang
Represented By: Henry Anthony Steinberg
Represented By: Sean Tamura-Sato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Peck
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Represented By: Lisa P Mak
Represented By: David Mendall McClain
Represented By: Denise Abrams
Represented By: Aron K. Liang
Represented By: Henry Anthony Steinberg
Represented By: Sean Tamura-Sato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Bosl
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Represented By: Lisa P Mak
Represented By: David Mendall McClain
Represented By: Denise Abrams
Represented By: Aron K. Liang
Represented By: Henry Anthony Steinberg
Represented By: Sean Tamura-Sato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mangalpal Takhar
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Represented By: Lisa P Mak
Represented By: David Mendall McClain
Represented By: Denise Abrams
Represented By: Aron K. Liang
Represented By: Henry Anthony Steinberg
Represented By: Sean Tamura-Sato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Kline
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Represented By: Lisa P Mak
Represented By: David Mendall McClain
Represented By: Denise Abrams
Represented By: Aron K. Liang
Represented By: Henry Anthony Steinberg
Represented By: Sean Tamura-Sato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Burt
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Represented By: Lisa P Mak
Represented By: David Mendall McClain
Represented By: Denise Abrams
Represented By: Aron K. Liang
Represented By: Henry Anthony Steinberg
Represented By: Sean Tamura-Sato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Butler
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Represented By: Lisa P Mak
Represented By: David Mendall McClain
Represented By: Denise Abrams
Represented By: Aron K. Liang
Represented By: Henry Anthony Steinberg
Represented By: Sean Tamura-Sato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory M Sirota
Represented By: Lisa P Mak
Represented By: David Mendall McClain
Represented By: Denise Abrams
Represented By: Aron K. Liang
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Represented By: Henry Anthony Steinberg
Represented By: Sean Tamura-Sato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Y Fong
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Represented By: Lisa P Mak
Represented By: David Mendall McClain
Represented By: Denise Abrams
Represented By: Aron K. Liang
Represented By: Henry Anthony Steinberg
Represented By: Sean Tamura-Sato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Chisom
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Represented By: Lisa P Mak
Represented By: David Mendall McClain
Represented By: Denise Abrams
Represented By: Aron K. Liang
Represented By: Henry Anthony Steinberg
Represented By: Sean Tamura-Sato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bosl
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Represented By: Lisa P Mak
Represented By: David Mendall McClain
Represented By: Denise Abrams
Represented By: Aron K. Liang
Represented By: Henry Anthony Steinberg
Represented By: Sean Tamura-Sato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Torgun
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Represented By: Lisa P Mak
Represented By: David Mendall McClain
Represented By: Denise Abrams
Represented By: Aron K. Liang
Represented By: Henry Anthony Steinberg
Represented By: Sean Tamura-Sato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Rovner
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Represented By: Lisa P Mak
Represented By: David Mendall McClain
Represented By: Denise Abrams
Represented By: Aron K. Liang
Represented By: Henry Anthony Steinberg
Represented By: Sean Tamura-Sato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Balmes
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Represented By: Lisa P Mak
Represented By: David Mendall McClain
Represented By: Denise Abrams
Represented By: Aron K. Liang
Represented By: Henry Anthony Steinberg
Represented By: Sean Tamura-Sato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Markovich
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Represented By: Lisa P Mak
Represented By: David Mendall McClain
Represented By: Denise Abrams
Represented By: Aron K. Liang
Represented By: Henry Anthony Steinberg
Represented By: Sean Tamura-Sato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Shapiro
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Represented By: Lisa P Mak
Represented By: David Mendall McClain
Represented By: Denise Abrams
Represented By: Aron K. Liang
Represented By: Henry Anthony Steinberg
Represented By: Sean Tamura-Sato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connor McDonald
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Represented By: Lisa P Mak
Represented By: David Mendall McClain
Represented By: Denise Abrams
Represented By: Aron K. Liang
Represented By: Henry Anthony Steinberg
Represented By: Sean Tamura-Sato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Shaw
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Represented By: Lisa P Mak
Represented By: David Mendall McClain
Represented By: Denise Abrams
Represented By: Aron K. Liang
Represented By: Henry Anthony Steinberg
Represented By: Sean Tamura-Sato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Katz
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Represented By: Lisa P Mak
Represented By: David Mendall McClain
Represented By: Denise Abrams
Represented By: Aron K. Liang
Represented By: Henry Anthony Steinberg
Represented By: Sean Tamura-Sato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Henry Marmolejo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?