Anderson et al v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A

Plaintiff: William Anderson and Mayuka Shibata
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A
Case Number: 3:2015cv04683
Filed: October 9, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 55 STIPULATION To Continue the ADR Completion Deadline and the Further Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/20/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/11/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
April 29, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 51 STIPULATION selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/29/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
April 19, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER granting as modified 38 MOTION for Michael Rapkine to Appear by Telephone at the Initial Case Management Conference. COUNSEL SHALL SUBMIT A NOTICE OF DIRECT LAND LINE BY 4:00 P.M. APRIL 22, 2016 (Correction of due date of submission). Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/19/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
April 13, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS PORTIONS OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Amended Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/22/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/29/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/13/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
January 8, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 19 MOTION to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/15/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/22/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/8/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2016)
November 5, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT: Case Management Statement due by 1/8/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/15/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/5/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2015)
November 3, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/3/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson et al v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Anderson
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayuka Shibata
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A
Represented By: Michael Rapkine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?