Elizabeth Larroque v. First Advantage LNS Screening Solutions, Inc.

Plaintiff: Elizabeth Larroque
Defendant: First Advantage LNS Screening Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv04684
Filed: October 9, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 2, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REMANDING CASE FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/2/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
June 21, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 7/13/2016. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/28/2016 at 09:00 AM., Courtroom F, 15th Floor in San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/21/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
May 26, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Request to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference filed by Elizabeth Larroque. Counsel shall contact Court Call at 1-888-882-6878 to make the arrangements to appear by telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/26/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
January 4, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 8 Motion to Stay (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
December 22, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Request to appear by telephone filed by Elizabeth Larroque. Counsel shall contact Court Call at 1-888-882-6878 to make the arrangements to appear by telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/22/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elizabeth Larroque v. First Advantage LNS Screening Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Larroque
Represented By: Lonnie Clifford Blanchard, III
Represented By: Peter Roald Dion-Kindem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Advantage LNS Screening Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Michael Lloyd
Represented By: G. Daniel Newland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?