Anthony Peel v. County of San Mateo et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Peel
Defendant: County of San Mateo and Greg Munks, San Mateo County Sheriff
Case Number: 3:2015cv04694
Filed: October 9, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Anthony Peel. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 13, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
August 22, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 33 Stipulation to Alter Pretrial Schedule Order; Proposed Order filed by Anthony Peel. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 22, 2016. Expert Disclosures 11/11/2016. Expert Rebuttal 11/30/2016. Fact Discovery Cut-Off 11/4/2016. Expert Discovery Cut-Off 12/21/2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2016)
June 20, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Alter Pretrial Scheduling Order filed by Anthony Peel. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 20, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
April 11, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 29 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re Stipulated Protective Order filed by Greg Munks, San Mateo County Sheriff, County of San Mateo. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 11, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
March 16, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Deadline to add parties or amend the pleadings 6/17/2016. Expert disclosures 9/21/2016. Expert rebuttal 11/11/2016. Fact discovery cut-off 11/18/2016. Expert discovery cut-off 12/14/2016. Deadline to file dispositive motion s 1/16/2017. Pretrial conference statement due 3/28/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/7/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 5/1/2017-5/11/2017 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 16, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 14, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 14, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
February 8, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
December 17, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 15 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by County of San Mateo, Greg Munks, San Mateo County Sheriff filed by Greg Munks, San Mateo County Sheriff, County of San Mateo. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 17, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony Peel v. County of San Mateo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Mateo
Represented By: Jan Ellen Ellard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Munks, San Mateo County Sheriff
Represented By: Jan Ellen Ellard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Peel
Represented By: Nicholas James Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?