Trustees of the U.A. Local 38 Defined Benefit Pension Plan v. Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipe Fitters National Pension Fund

Plaintiff: Trustees of the U.A. Local 38 Defined Benefit Pension Plan
Defendant: Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipe Fitters National Pension Fund
Case Number: 3:2015cv04703
Filed: October 9, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 09:0010
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 21, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON CROSS PETITIONS re Denying 1 Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award filed by Trustees of the U.A. Local 38 Defined Benefit Pension Plan; re Granting 17 Counterclaim/Cross Petition to Confirm the Liability Award and Damages Award, filed by Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipe Fitters National Pension Fund. The arbitration awards are CONFIRMED. Defendant shall file a proposed form of judgment approved as to form by plaintiff within (7) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/21/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
December 15, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 28 Order to Show Cause.12/18/2015 at 9:01am Hearing is VACATED.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/15/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
November 19, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING STAY PENDING APPEAL IN RELATED ACTION. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/18/2015 09:01 AM. Show Cause Response due by 12/11/2015. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/19/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
October 26, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/26/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the U.A. Local 38 Defined Benefit Pension Plan v. Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipe Fitters National Pension Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the U.A. Local 38 Defined Benefit Pension Plan
Represented By: James P. Baker
Represented By: Emily Lynn Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipe Fitters National Pension Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Demain
Represented By: Louis P. Malone, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?