Brattain v. Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Russell Brattain
Defendant: Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc. and Reynolds American, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv04705
Filed: October 9, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 37 STIPULATION to Stay All Case Proceedings Pending MDL Determination. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/22/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 13, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Briefs re 22 Motion to Dismiss and 26 Amended Request for Judicial Notice.Oppositions due by 1/20/2016. Replies due by 2/3/2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 13, 2016. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
December 15, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 24 STIPULATION RE Briefing Schedule. Responses due by 1/13/2016. Replies due by 1/27/2016. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/15/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2015) Modified on 12/15/2015 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
October 16, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT Case Management Statement due by 1/15/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/16/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brattain v. Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Brattain
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Lopatin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc.
Represented By: David Craig Kiernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reynolds American, Inc.
Represented By: David Craig Kiernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?