Williams-Sonoma, Inc. v. Argento SC by Sicura Inc.

Plaintiff: Williams-Sonoma, Inc.
Defendant: Argento SC by Sicura Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv04751
Filed: October 14, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 12/5/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2016)
February 25, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Vince Chhabria. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/25/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2016)
December 29, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 10 Proposed Order To Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by Williams-Sonoma, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 2/19/2016. Case Management Conference re-set for 2/26/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/29/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams-Sonoma, Inc. v. Argento SC by Sicura Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Williams-Sonoma, Inc.
Represented By: Gia L. Cincone
Represented By: Gregory S. Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argento SC by Sicura Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?