Valencia et al v. Comcast Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Lamberto Valencia, Mark A. Perdue, Philip Richard Martin and Estate of Efren Agana
Defendant: Comcast Corporation, Comcast of Contra Costa, Inc. and Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv04771
Filed: October 15, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2017 88 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas denying 56 Motion for Sanctions.(njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017) Modified on 2/21/2017 (njvlc1, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/21/2017 (njvlc1, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/22/2016.(rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
January 12, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Court, in the interest of judicial economy, continues the Case Management Conference currently scheduled for January 15, 2016, to February 5, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 12, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)
December 22, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 22, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015)
October 30, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND EXHIBITS. To facilitate the Court's review of the case, defendant is directed to submit forthwith chambers copies of the Notice of Removal and all exhibits attached thereto. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 30, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
October 21, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/21/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valencia et al v. Comcast Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamberto Valencia
Represented By: John Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A. Perdue
Represented By: John Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Richard Martin
Represented By: John Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Efren Agana
Represented By: John Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Corporation
Represented By: Fred W. Alvarez
Represented By: Erin M. Doyle
Represented By: Allison B. Moser
Represented By: Emilie Reeslund
Represented By: Stephen Luther Taeusch
Represented By: Troy A. Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast of Contra Costa, Inc.
Represented By: Fred W. Alvarez
Represented By: Erin M. Doyle
Represented By: Allison B. Moser
Represented By: Emilie Reeslund
Represented By: Stephen Luther Taeusch
Represented By: Troy A. Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC
Represented By: Fred W. Alvarez
Represented By: Erin M. Doyle
Represented By: Allison B. Moser
Represented By: Emilie Reeslund
Represented By: Troy A. Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?