Stanford Hospitals & Clinics v. Manpower Demonstration Research Corporation Employee Health Care Plan et al

Plaintiff: Stanford Hospitals & Clinics
Defendant: Manpower Demonstration Research Corporation Employee Health Care Plan and Pomco, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv04800
Filed: October 16, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING 23 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Stanford Hospitals & Clinics. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/13/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
April 15, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT. Joint Statement or Stipulated Dismissal due due by 6/23/2016. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/30/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/15/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
March 18, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/18/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanford Hospitals & Clinics v. Manpower Demonstration Research Corporation Employee Health Care Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanford Hospitals & Clinics
Represented By: Jennifer Jiao
Represented By: Richard Alan Lovich
Represented By: Karlene Jasmine Rogers-Aberman
Represented By: Joy Young Stephenson
Represented By: Barry Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manpower Demonstration Research Corporation Employee Health Care Plan
Represented By: Clarissa A. Kang
Represented By: Sean T. Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pomco, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Michael MacPhail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?