Peter Englert v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Plaintiff: Peter Englert
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2015cv04814
Filed: October 19, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2017 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 67 Stipulation For Dismissal of Entire Action with Prejudice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2017) Modified on 10/30/2017 to correct action (ndrS, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/21/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2017)
April 5, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 50 Motion to Appear by Telephone at the Case Management Conference on April 11, 2017. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582- 6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
March 27, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 38 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING 41 MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF STANDARD OF REVIEW; SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/4/2017; Case Management Conference set for 4/11/2017 02:00 PM. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
June 10, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 34 Motion to Appear by Telephone at the Case Management Conference of June 28, 2016. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582- 6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
June 9, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 31 Stipulation TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
May 13, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 20 MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S SECOND CLAIM FOR RELIEF.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
December 30, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 18 Motion to Appear by Telephone at the Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peter Englert v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Englert
Represented By: Terrence J. Coleman
Represented By: Michael James Quirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?