Biggar v. Google Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan et al

Plaintiff: Jonathan Biggar
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America, California Voluntary Disability and Paid Family Leave Plan for Employees of Google and Google Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan
Case Number: 3:2015cv04825
Filed: October 20, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANTS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 49 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 50 Motion for Summary Judgment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
March 7, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 44 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Dismiss California Voluntary Disability and Family Leave Plan filed by Jonathan Biggar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 7, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2017)
September 7, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND RELATED DATES re 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Hearing on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment and Related Dates filed by Googl e Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Prudential Insurance Company of America, California Voluntary Disability and Paid Family Leave Plan for Employees of Google. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 7, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
March 23, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/23/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
January 27, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery cut-off 9/30/2016. Hearing date on cross-motions for summary judgment set for 11/3/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 27, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
January 7, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 18 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Prudential Insurance Company of America filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 7, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biggar v. Google Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Biggar
Represented By: Scott D. Kalkin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Sevana Babooian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Voluntary Disability and Paid Family Leave Plan for Employees of Google
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?