Balsam Brands Inc. et al v. Cinmar, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Balsam Brands Inc. and Balsam International Limited
Defendant: Cinmar, LLC and Frontgate Marketing, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv04829
Filed: October 20, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2016 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/20/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
December 6, 2016 142 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 115 Motion for Sanctions. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
September 1, 2016 108 Opinion or Order of the Court CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/01/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2016)
August 22, 2016 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 99 Administrative Motion. Reply Claim Construction Brief is August 23, 2016. The Claim Construction Hearing is reset for 8/29/2016 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/22/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2016)
November 30, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL - granting 46 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. If plaintiffs want any of the documents filed at Dkt. No. 40 to remain under seal, they shall file a declaration in support of sealing on or before December 4, 2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/30/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 13, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE UNREDACTED DOCUMENTS set by 42 Order on Motion for TRO. Plaintiffs shall file and serve unredacted versions of the documents by November 23, 2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/13/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
November 12, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 11 Motion for TRO. By November 16, 2015, plaintiffs shall file with the Court and serve on Frontgate unredacted versions of the documents they filed on November 6, 2015 (Dkt. No. 37). If plaintiffs wish to file the unredacted versions under seal, they shall do so pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5 and my Standing Order on Administrative Motions to File Under Seal.(jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2015)
November 3, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Minute Entry construed as Order to reflect bench order granting leave to file sealed documents). Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/03/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balsam Brands Inc. et al v. Cinmar, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cinmar, LLC
Represented By: Kevin W. Kirsch
Represented By: Patricia L. Peden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontgate Marketing, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin W. Kirsch
Represented By: Patricia L. Peden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Balsam Brands Inc.
Represented By: Marc N. Bernstein
Represented By: Will Barnett Fitton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Balsam International Limited
Represented By: Marc N. Bernstein
Represented By: Will Barnett Fitton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?