Shinbori v. Standard Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Dennis Shinbori
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company and Minnesota Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2015cv04842
Filed: October 21, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 25, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Dismiss Entire Action with Prejudice filed by Standard Insurance Company, Minnesota Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 25, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
March 30, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Extend Mediation Deadline by Sixty (60) Days filed by Standard Insurance Company, Minnesota Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 30, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
January 27, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Deadline to add parties or amend the pleadings 2/10/2016. Deadline to file dispositive motions 8/18/2016. Fact discovery cut-off 9/23/2016. Expert disclosures 10/21/2016. Expert rebuttal 11/11/2016. Expert discovery cut-off 12/9/2016. Pretrial conference statement due 1/10/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/20/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 2/13/2017 - 2/22/2017 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 27, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
January 6, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 18 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Standard Insurance Company filed by Standard Insurance Company, Minnesota Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 6, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2016)
October 28, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/28/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shinbori v. Standard Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Sevana Babooian
Represented By: Linda Marie Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Sevana Babooian
Represented By: Linda Marie Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Shinbori
Represented By: Elizabeth Diane Fleming
Represented By: Michael B. Horrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?