United States of America v. Raymond Chico et al

Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Raymond Chico, Ruby Espinoza Chico and Andre Robert Bustos
Case Number: 3:2015cv04843
Filed: October 21, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 30, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 6 OSC; granting 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Raymond Chico. Responses due by 1/6/2016. Replies due by 1/8/2016. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/29/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2015)
November 12, 2015 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/15/2016 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 12/28/2015. Signed by Judge Charles R Breyer on 11/12/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2015) Modified on 11/12/2015 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2015 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/22/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Raymond Chico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Lindsay Laurie Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Raymond Chico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ruby Espinoza Chico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Andre Robert Bustos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?