Eileen Brown et al v. Freedom West Homes, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Eileen Brown, Prentiss Belton, Michelle Harris, Evelyn Jones-MacGlaun, Ethel Benson, Keisha Finley, Keisha Jones, Dorotha Graham, Barbara Kerlegan, Corinne Harper, Deena Perkins, Lessie Brown, Sabrina Parish, Ellyn Ginden-Cooper, Tanya Twyman, Zelphia Connor, Antoinette Blue and Lashawn Jeffries
Defendant: Freedom West Homes, Inc., Alton Management Corporation, William Hutton, Raymond Brown and Anason Won Pak
Case Number: 3:2015cv04874
Filed: October 22, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2016 83 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 81 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER that Pak's Answer to the First Amended Complaint Be Deemed Pak's Answer to the Second Amended Complaint filed by Anason Won Pak. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/4/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
June 15, 2016 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 73 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Alton Management Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/15/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2016)
April 11, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 60 MOTION to Vacate Entry of Default Stipulation to Set Aside Entry of Default Against Defendant Anason Won Pak. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/11/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
December 23, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Breifing Sche filed by Eileen Brown. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/23/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eileen Brown et al v. Freedom West Homes, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Brown
Represented By: Jean K Hyams
Represented By: Ruth L. Israely
Represented By: Yosef Peretz
Represented By: Sharon Rachel Vinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prentiss Belton
Represented By: Jean K Hyams
Represented By: Ruth L. Israely
Represented By: Yosef Peretz
Represented By: Sharon Rachel Vinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Harris
Represented By: Jean K Hyams
Represented By: Ruth L. Israely
Represented By: Yosef Peretz
Represented By: Sharon Rachel Vinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Jones-MacGlaun
Represented By: Jean K Hyams
Represented By: Ruth L. Israely
Represented By: Yosef Peretz
Represented By: Sharon Rachel Vinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethel Benson
Represented By: Jean K Hyams
Represented By: Ruth L. Israely
Represented By: Yosef Peretz
Represented By: Sharon Rachel Vinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keisha Finley
Represented By: Jean K Hyams
Represented By: Ruth L. Israely
Represented By: Yosef Peretz
Represented By: Sharon Rachel Vinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keisha Jones
Represented By: Jean K Hyams
Represented By: Ruth L. Israely
Represented By: Yosef Peretz
Represented By: Sharon Rachel Vinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorotha Graham
Represented By: Jean K Hyams
Represented By: Ruth L. Israely
Represented By: Yosef Peretz
Represented By: Sharon Rachel Vinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Kerlegan
Represented By: Jean K Hyams
Represented By: Ruth L. Israely
Represented By: Yosef Peretz
Represented By: Sharon Rachel Vinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corinne Harper
Represented By: Jean K Hyams
Represented By: Ruth L. Israely
Represented By: Yosef Peretz
Represented By: Sharon Rachel Vinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deena Perkins
Represented By: Jean K Hyams
Represented By: Ruth L. Israely
Represented By: Yosef Peretz
Represented By: Sharon Rachel Vinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lessie Brown
Represented By: Jean K Hyams
Represented By: Ruth L. Israely
Represented By: Yosef Peretz
Represented By: Sharon Rachel Vinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Parish
Represented By: Jean K Hyams
Represented By: Ruth L. Israely
Represented By: Yosef Peretz
Represented By: Sharon Rachel Vinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellyn Ginden-Cooper
Represented By: Jean K Hyams
Represented By: Ruth L. Israely
Represented By: Yosef Peretz
Represented By: Sharon Rachel Vinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Twyman
Represented By: Jean K Hyams
Represented By: Ruth L. Israely
Represented By: Yosef Peretz
Represented By: Sharon Rachel Vinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zelphia Connor
Represented By: Jean K Hyams
Represented By: Ruth L. Israely
Represented By: Yosef Peretz
Represented By: Sharon Rachel Vinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoinette Blue
Represented By: Jean K Hyams
Represented By: Ruth L. Israely
Represented By: Yosef Peretz
Represented By: Sharon Rachel Vinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lashawn Jeffries
Represented By: Jean K Hyams
Represented By: Ruth L. Israely
Represented By: Yosef Peretz
Represented By: Sharon Rachel Vinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom West Homes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alton Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anason Won Pak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?