Sven Hemmert, et al v. David Finn, et al

Plaintiff: Sven Hemmert, Sue-Ellen Speight and C.H.
Defendant: David Finn, Amy Finn, National Park Service and Golden Gate National Recreation Area
Case Number: 3:2015cv04904
Filed: October 26, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO REMAND CASE - The case is remanded to the Superior Court of California, County of Marin. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/21/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2016)
September 30, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DEADLINE as to 44 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 10/13/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/30/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
June 13, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO CONTINUE DEADLINE FOR UNITED STATES OF AMERICA TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMDENDED COMPLAINT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DATE granting 40 STIPULATION. Case Management Conference continued to 8/16/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 8/9/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/13/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
May 27, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Striking 37 Order on Stipulation. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/27/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
April 25, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Stipulation. Case Management Statement due by 6/14/2016. Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/25/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
March 17, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE FOR UNITED STATES OF AMERICA TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DATE. The United States shall have until April 27, 2016 to respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Case Management Statement due by 4/26/2016. Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/17/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
January 11, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DEADLINE FOR RESPONSE TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN LIGHT OF AGREEMENT TO MEDIATE CASE re 22 STIPULATION. Case Management Conference continued to 3/29/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 3/22/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/11/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sven Hemmert, et al v. David Finn, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sven Hemmert
Represented By: Craig Sheridan Miller
Represented By: William Steven Weisberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue-Ellen Speight
Represented By: Craig Sheridan Miller
Represented By: William Steven Weisberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.H.
Represented By: Craig Sheridan Miller
Represented By: William Steven Weisberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Finn
Represented By: Jose Anthony Montalvo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Finn
Represented By: Jose Anthony Montalvo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Park Service
Represented By: Michael Thomas Pyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Gate National Recreation Area
Represented By: Michael Thomas Pyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?