Thomas E. Perez v. i2A Technologies, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Thomas E. Perez and United States Department of Labor
Defendant: i2A Technologies, Inc and Victor Batinovich
Case Number: 3:2015cv04963
Filed: October 28, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/9/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2016)
September 7, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE SEPTEMBER 8 HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/7/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
August 12, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR HEARINGS ON MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 55 49 Motion Hearing set for 9/8/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/12/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
July 28, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE TO NEW COUNSEL AND VICTOR BATINOVICH. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/28/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
March 1, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESCINDING CUSTODY ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/1/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
February 18, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SECRETARY OF LABORS MOTION TO INCARCERATE DEFENDANT VICTOR BATINOVICH FOR FAILING TO PURGE DEFENDANTS CIVIL CONTEMPT by Hon. William Alsup granting 29 .(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
January 19, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DEFENDANT BATINOVICH SHOULD NOT BE INCARCERATED FOR FAILING TO PURGE DEFENDANTS' CIVIL CONTEMPT Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 2/18/2016 08:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 1/27/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/19/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
November 17, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SECRETARY OF LABORS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/17/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
November 3, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/17/2015 09:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 11/10/2015 at NOON. Reply Due 11/13/2015 at NOON.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/3/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
October 29, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER re 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Responses due by 11/2/2015 at noon. Motion Hearing set for 11/3/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/29/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas E. Perez v. i2A Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Perez
Represented By: Rose Darling
Represented By: Tara E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Department of Labor
Represented By: Rose Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: i2A Technologies, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Batinovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?