Apple Inc. v. BYD Company Limited et al

Petitioner: Apple Inc.
Respondent: BYD Company Limited and BYD Precision Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2015cv04985
Filed: October 29, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2016 76 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/28/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2016)
April 4, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS BYD PRECISION MANUFACTURING CO., LTD., AND BYD COMPANY LIMITED. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/4/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
January 25, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER 50 TO CONTINUE HEARING ON APPLE'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND BYD COMPANY LIMITED'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/25/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2016)
December 21, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER 39 TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF AND CONTINUE HEARING AND EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION AND REPLY BRIEFS AND CONTINUE HEAARING. Motions Hearing set for 1/28/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/21/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
November 23, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION AND REPLY BRIEFS (PETITIONER APPLE INCS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION) AND RESPONSE TO PETITION. Motion Hearing previously set for 12/17/15 Continued to 1/14/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/23/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apple Inc. v. BYD Company Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Represented By: Peter Coyne Thomas
Represented By: Janet Mary Whittaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BYD Company Limited
Represented By: Lance Allan Etcheverry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BYD Precision Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Lance Allan Etcheverry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?