Core Wireless Licensing S.a.r.l. v. Apple Inc.

Plaintiff: Core Wireless Licensing S.a.r.l.
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Mediator: Harlan Martin
Miscellaneous: Richard D. Egan
Case Number: 3:2015cv05007
Filed: October 30, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:183
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 24, 2016 215 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Request to Withdraw as Counsel. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/24/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
June 15, 2016 205 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg Staying 196 Action. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2016)
June 6, 2016 203 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING AND REQUESTING FURTHER BRIEFING RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A STAY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/6/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
February 11, 2016 183 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Claims Construction Hearing set for 6/8/2016 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/11/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Core Wireless Licensing S.a.r.l. v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Core Wireless Licensing S.a.r.l.
Represented By: Zachary Truman Elsea
Represented By: Padraic William Foran
Represented By: Alexander C.D. Giza
Represented By: Christopher Mitchell Hendy
Represented By: Andrew James Junker
Represented By: Xinlin Li
Represented By: Theresa Mary Troupson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: John Verble Hobgood
Represented By: Joseph J. Mueller
Represented By: Richard W O'Neill
Represented By: David McDonald Prichard
Represented By: Anant Saraswat
Represented By: Katie Marie Saxton, Esq.
Represented By: Mark Daniel Selwyn
Represented By: David R. Smith
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Timothy Davis Syrett
Represented By: Cynthia D. Vreeland
Represented By: Jonathan W Woodard
Represented By: Kathryn Zalewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Harlan Martin
Represented By: Harlan A Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Richard D. Egan
Represented By: Richard D. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?