Judan et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, As Lender et al

Plaintiff: Manuel A. Judan and Marylyn Callejo-Judan
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, As Lender and Buckley Madole, PC, As Trustee
Case Number: 3:2015cv05029
Filed: November 2, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 17, 2017 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 62 Stipulation re Set Deadlines/Hearings: Close of Fact Discovery due by 5/31/2018; Designation of Experts due by 6/15/2018; Designation of Rebuttal Experts due by 6/29/2018; Close of Expe rt Discovery due by 7/13/2018; Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2018 03:00 PM; Jury Selection / Jury Trial set for 12/3/2018 08:30 AM before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
October 18, 2017 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 57 Motion to Appear by Telephone at the Motion to Dismiss Hearing. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
July 21, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 30 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
November 10, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 37 Motion to Appear by Telephone at November 17, 2016 Hearing on Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
August 19, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT(Denying as moot 9 Motion to Dismiss; Granting 25 Motion for Leave to File). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Judan et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, As Lender et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel A. Judan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marylyn Callejo-Judan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, As Lender
Represented By: Viddell Lee Heard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckley Madole, PC, As Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?