Torres v. City Of Oakland et al

Plaintiff: Joseph Torres
Defendant: City Of Oakland, Oakland Fire Department and Teresa Deloach Reed
Case Number: 3:2015cv05075
Filed: November 5, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2017 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion for Summary Judgment (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2017)
April 1, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 24 Stipulation to Extend Time for Completion of ENE filed by City Of Oakland, Oakland Fire Department, Teresa Deloach Reed. ENE to be completed no later than 6/17/16 Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/1/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2016)
March 3, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 21 Stipulation to Reschedule Case Management Statement and Case Management ConferenceDates filed by City Of Oakland, Oakland Fire Department, Teresa Deloach Reed Case Management Statement due by 6/3/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/10/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/3/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2016)
March 2, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED re 19 Stipulation, filed by City Of Oakland, Oakland Fire Department, Teresa Deloach Reed Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed, as modified, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/2/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2016)
January 27, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 9 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by City Of Oakland, Oakland Fire Department, Teresa Deloach Reed. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/27/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. City Of Oakland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Torres
Represented By: Bryan W Vereschagin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Oakland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland Fire Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Deloach Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?