Nora Salamanca v. Sprint/United Management Company

Plaintiff: Nora Salamanca
Defendant: Sprint/United Management Company
Case Number: 3:2015cv05084
Filed: November 5, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2017 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Motion 37 for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Motion for Final Approval and Attorneys' Fees due by 12/27/2017. Fairness Hearing set for 3/2/2018 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/8/2017. (jswlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
August 4, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Stipulation Vacating Post-Mediation Status Conference Set for August 12, 2016; AND INSTRUCTIONS TO THE PARTIES. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/4/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
June 6, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 25 STIPULATION To Further Stay All Proceedings and Set A Post-Mediation Status Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/5/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/12/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/6/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
February 1, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 20 STIPULATION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS AND SET A POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/10/2016. Case Management Conference set for 6/17/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/1/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
November 17, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/29/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/17/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nora Salamanca v. Sprint/United Management Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nora Salamanca
Represented By: Tuvia Korobkin
Represented By: Chaim Shaun Setareh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint/United Management Company
Represented By: Harold M. Brody
Represented By: Enzo Der Boghossian
Represented By: Anthony J DiBenedetto
Represented By: Keith Allyn Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?