Shepardson v. Adecco USA, Inc.

Plaintiff: Kaitlyn Shepardson
Defendant: Adecco USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv05102
Filed: November 6, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 39 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Adecco USA, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 1/25/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/30/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2017)
November 14, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 36 Case Management Statement filed by Kaitlyn Shepardson. Case Management Statement due by 12/5/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2017 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/14/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
June 27, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Kaitlyn Shepardson. Case Management Statement due by 9/28/2017. Further Case Management Conference reset for 10/5/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/27/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2017)
April 5, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 14 Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration.(emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
March 1, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 18 Case Management Scheduling Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Adecco USA, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 4/14/2016. Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/1/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shepardson v. Adecco USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaitlyn Shepardson
Represented By: John Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Represented By: Michael C. Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adecco USA, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Westcott O'Dell
Represented By: Julie Erin Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?