Morris v. SolarCity Corp.

Plaintiff: George Morris
Defendant: SolarCity Corp.
Case Number: 3:2015cv05107
Filed: November 6, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227 Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 9, 2017 113 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 110 Extending Deadline for Opposition and Reply Briefs Regarding Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Randall A. Snyder. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/9/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
July 28, 2016 80 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFFS' 76 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL re 78 . Defendant's opposition due 8/2/16; plaintiffs' reply due 8/9/16. The noticed hearing date of 9/1/16 at 1:30 p.m. will not change. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/27/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
July 27, 2016 79 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/26/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
May 16, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
April 21, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Motion for Class Certification Hearing set for 3/9/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/21/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
April 7, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Discovery Letter by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
April 6, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 35 Motion to Dismiss.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
March 18, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Discovery Procedures by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
February 29, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/29/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
February 17, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 25 Motion to Stay. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
February 9, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS, STRIKE, AND STAY, AND RE MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/9/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. SolarCity Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Morris
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Yeremey O. Krivoshey
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SolarCity Corp.
Represented By: Claudia Yvette Sanchez Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?