City Of Oakland v. Monsanto Company et al

Plaintiff: City Of Oakland
Defendant: Monsanto Company, Solutia Inc and Pharmacia Corporation
Case Number: 3:2015cv05152
Filed: November 10, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2017 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 118 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF ORDER FOR APPEAL. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/6/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
August 4, 2017 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 98 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/4/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
February 3, 2017 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 81 DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINTS. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/3/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
April 7, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION ORDER - DENYING TRANSFER. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
November 23, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases: Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12(c), the above-entitled case is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable Edward J. Davila for consideration of whether the case is related to City of San Jose v. Monsanto Company, 15-cv-03178-EJD. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/23/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City Of Oakland v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City Of Oakland
Represented By: John Paul Fiske
Represented By: John H. Gomez
Represented By: Otis McGee, Jr.
Represented By: Barbara J. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Jennifer P. Casler-Goncalves
Represented By: Andrea Maria Hogan
Represented By: Robert Mont Howard
Represented By: Kelly Eugene Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solutia Inc
Represented By: Jennifer P. Casler-Goncalves
Represented By: Andrea Maria Hogan
Represented By: Robert Mont Howard
Represented By: Kelly Eugene Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer P. Casler-Goncalves
Represented By: Andrea Maria Hogan
Represented By: Robert Mont Howard
Represented By: Kelly Eugene Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?