Lemos v. County of Sonoma et al
Plaintiff: Gabbi Lemos
Defendant: County of Sonoma, Steve Freitas and Marcus Holton
Case Number: 3:2015cv05188
Filed: November 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/29/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/12/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on April 6, 2016. (ygrlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY re 24 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Marcus Holton, County of Sonoma, Steve Freitas. Attorney is Richard W. Osman for Sonoma County Defendants.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/17/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSEThe Court's Order to Show Cause dated February 23, 2016 (Dkt. No. 19) is VACATED. re 19 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/25/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2016)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/14/2016 02:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 3/7/2016. Case Management Conference set for 2/29/2016 is CONTINUED to Monday, 3/14/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/23/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/5/16. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lemos v. County of Sonoma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabbi Lemos
Represented By: Izaak David Schwaiger
Represented By: John Houston Scott
Represented By: Lizabeth N. de Vries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sonoma
Represented By: Robert Wayne Henkels
Represented By: Steven Corson Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Freitas
Represented By: Robert Wayne Henkels
Represented By: Steven Corson Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Holton
Represented By: Robert Wayne Henkels
Represented By: Steven Corson Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?