Ruden v. C. R. Bard, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Wayne Ruden
Defendant: C. R. Bard, Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. and California Pacific Medical Center
Case Number: 3:2015cv05189
Filed: November 12, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MDL TRANSFER ORDER MDL NO. 2641: Transferring case to the U.S. District Court, District of Arizona. Signed by The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, on 02/04/2016. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
December 10, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 44 MOTION to Advance Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Remand TO BE HEARD WITH PENDING MOTIONS. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/10/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
November 19, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT: Case Management Statement due by 2/12/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/19/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/19/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruden v. C. R. Bard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Ruden
Represented By: Kirsten McNelly Bibbes
Represented By: Nevin Christopher Brownfield
Represented By: David Raymond Ongaro
Represented By: Glen Elliot Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Steven J. Boranian
Represented By: Mark A. Sentenac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Steven J. Boranian
Represented By: Mark A. Sentenac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Pacific Medical Center
Represented By: Hilary Youngblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?