Rodgers v. Lee et al

Plaintiff: John Rodgers
Defendant: King Bor Lee, Foon C. Lee and RM Chevys LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv05258
Filed: November 17, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/18/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
October 17, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/8/2016 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 12/2/2016. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/17/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
August 29, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Mediation Deadline from September 6, 2016 to October 14, 2016. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/29/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodgers v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Rodgers
Represented By: Irakli M. Karbelashvili
Represented By: Irene Lenislav Karbelashvili
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King Bor Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foon C. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RM Chevys LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?