Carias v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Ricarda Carias
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2015cv05274
Filed: September 21, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Additional Time to File Reply by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
February 19, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Service of Process by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
November 17, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to open a new case entitled Ricarda Carias v. United States of America. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 11/17/15. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carias v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricarda Carias
Represented By: Brian Leroy Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?