Provost v. Rite Aid Corporation

Plaintiff: Ruby Provost
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Case Number: 3:2015cv05280
Filed: November 18, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 39 STIPULATED DISMISSAL.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
April 20, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 29 .(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
April 4, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Provost v. Rite Aid Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Provost
Represented By: John Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Represented By: Michael C. Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Represented By: Regan A.W. Herald
Represented By: Rishi N. Sharma
Represented By: Jeffrey David Wohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?