InteraXon Inc. et al v. Neurotek, LLC et al

Plaintiff: InteraXon Inc. and InteraXon U.S., Inc.
Defendant: Neurotek, LLC, Mindwaves, Ltd. and Jonathan D. Cowan
Case Number: 3:2015cv05290
Filed: November 18, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2017 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 141 Plaintiffs' Motion to File a First Amended Complaint; Denying 146 Defendant's Motion to Postpone Deadlines; Regarding 147 Plaintiffs' Second Discovery Letter and [14 4] Defendant's Discovery Letter; Denying 149 Defendant's Motion to Strike; Denying 158 Defendant's Motion for Administrative Relief to Expand page Limits. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/3/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
September 28, 2016 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 124 Motion for Attorney Fees. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
September 27, 2016 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 134 Motion to Extend Deadlines and Vacating Hearing Date on 72 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/27/2016. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2016)
September 21, 2016 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Regarding 127 130 Discovery Letter Briefs. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2016)
July 25, 2016 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 72 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment filed by InteraXon U.S., Inc., InteraXon Inc.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/25/2016. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
July 20, 2016 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 58 Second MOTION to Set Aside Default for Mindwaves and NeuroTek filed by Jonathan Daniel Cowan. Hearing on motion for default judgment continued to 11/17/2016 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 07/20/16. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
July 1, 2016 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING UNUSUABLE CHAMBERS COPIES re 76 First MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs and Their Attorneys filed by Jonathan Daniel Cowan, 58 Second MOTION to Set Aside Default for Mindwaves and NeuroTek filed by Jonat han Daniel Cowan, 87 Reply to Opposition/Response filed by InteraXon U.S., Inc., InteraXon Inc., 56 MOTION for repeal of privileges of Plaintiff's Attorney's filed by Jonathan Daniel Cowan, 81 Opposition/Response to Motion file d by InteraXon U.S., Inc., InteraXon Inc., 72 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment filed by InteraXon U.S., Inc., InteraXon Inc., 55 MOTION to Strike Complaint filed by Jonathan Dan iel Cowan, 54 MOTION to Strike filed by InteraXon U.S., Inc., InteraXon Inc., 80 MOTION to Strike filed by InteraXon U.S., Inc., InteraXon Inc.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 07/01/16. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 14, 2016 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 6/28/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/5/2016 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 6/14/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: InteraXon Inc. et al v. Neurotek, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: InteraXon Inc.
Represented By: David Heskel Ben-Meir
Represented By: Robert L Greeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: InteraXon U.S., Inc.
Represented By: David Heskel Ben-Meir
Represented By: Robert L Greeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neurotek, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mindwaves, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?