Sharon Robinson v. Wells Fargo Advisors, et al

Plaintiff: Sharon Robinson
Defendant: Wells Fargo Advisors and Wells Fargo & Company
Case Number: 3:2015cv05304
Filed: November 19, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 31 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS AGAINST WELLS FARGO & COMPANY ANDWELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
October 5, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 23 Stipulation For Arbitration of Claims Against Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
June 28, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 34 Stipulation For Continuance of Hearing Date and Revised Briefing Schedule on Defendants' 31 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
June 7, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 32 Stipulation Continuing Hearing Date and Revising Briefing Schedule on Motion for Summary Judgment. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
May 2, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 26 Stipulation For Revised Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motions. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharon Robinson v. Wells Fargo Advisors, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Robinson
Represented By: James McCarty Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Advisors
Represented By: Robert Todd Sullwold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Represented By: Robert Todd Sullwold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?