H.P.D. Consolidation, Inc. v. Pina et al

Plaintiff: H.P.D. Consolidation, Inc.
Defendant: Jose Pina, Edwin Whitefield, David L Borges, Michael Shemali, Rajiv Malhan, Wines of the World, LLC, Tri Cities Liquor & Spirits, LLC, Hi-Time Wine Cellars, Matt Myers, Sandra Rodriguez, Eduardo Rodriguez, Sandi's Pet Place, Inc. and Belmont Wine Exchange, LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv05309
Filed: November 19, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2017 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 152 Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
December 13, 2016 154 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 153 RESCHEDULING HEARING ON "CERTAIN DEFENDANTS" MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES. Responses due by 1/12/2017. Replies due by 1/26/2017. Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/13/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
November 23, 2016 148 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 147 TO EXTEND FILING DEADLINES FOR OPPOSITIONS AND REPLIES AND RESCHEDULE HEARING RELATED TO MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE filed by H.P.D. Consolidation, Inc. Responses due by 11/28/2016. Replies due by 12/5/2016. Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/23/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2016)
April 15, 2016 106 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 105 TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS filed by H.P.D. Consolidation, Inc. re: 101 MOTION to Dismiss and 102 MOTION to Dismiss by Certain Defendants to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. Responses due by 4/25/2016. Replies due by 5/5/2016. Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/15/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
March 23, 2016 100 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 99 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal without Prejudice as to Ragiv Malhan only. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/23/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
March 22, 2016 98 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 95 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Allowing Filing of Pages in Excess of Page Limitation filed by Rajiv Malhan (Denied as moot). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/22/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
February 22, 2016 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 86 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/22/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
February 11, 2016 81 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 75 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Vacating Defaults and Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Matt Myers, Tri Cities Liquor & Spirits, LLC, Sandi's Pet Place, Inc., Belmont Wine Exchange, LLC, Wines of the World, LLC, Michael Shemali, Eduardo Rodriguez, Sandra Rodriguez, Hi-Time Wine Cellars. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/11/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
February 10, 2016 80 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 79 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reschedule Case Management Conference filed by Rajiv Malhan. CMC reset for 5/5/16 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/10/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H.P.D. Consolidation, Inc. v. Pina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.P.D. Consolidation, Inc.
Represented By: Russell Kent Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Pina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Whitefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L Borges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Shemali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajiv Malhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wines of the World, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri Cities Liquor & Spirits, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hi-Time Wine Cellars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduardo Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandi's Pet Place, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belmont Wine Exchange, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?