Slovin v. Sunrun, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Lynn Slovin
Defendant: Sunrun, Inc. and Clean Energy Experts, LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv05340
Filed: November 20, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2017 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES ( 112 , 117 , 125 , 129 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/15/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
July 7, 2017 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DECLARE INEFFECTIVE DEFENDANTS' OFFER OF JUDGMENT re 89 MOTION to Declare Ineffective Defendants' Offer of Judgment Dated March 21, 2017 Rule 68 Offer filed by Justin Birkhofer, Lynn Slovin, Jeffery Price, Samuel Katz. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/7/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
June 13, 2017 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 99 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 101 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
May 15, 2017 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF ( 94 & 96 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/15/2017.(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
November 21, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Corley for all Discovery purposes, ORDER REFERRING CASE to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference to be completed by 2/14/2017. Plaintiff Class Certification Motions filed by 7/3/2017. Compliance hearing is set for Friday, 3/3/2017 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/21/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
October 12, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 51 Defendants' Motion to Strike. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2016)
April 28, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 36 Motion to Strike with Leave to Amend. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
February 18, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 21 STIPULATION EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FAC filed by Sunrun, Inc., Clean Energy Experts, LLC and MAINTAINING MARCH 21,2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/18/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slovin v. Sunrun, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Slovin
Represented By: Suzanne Havens Beckman
Represented By: Yitzchak Hillel Lieberman
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrun, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine Dong Eun Lee
Represented By: Lauri Anne Mazzuchetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clean Energy Experts, LLC
Represented By: Catherine Dong Eun Lee
Represented By: Lauri Anne Mazzuchetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?