Malibu Media, LLC v. JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 71.202.112.89

Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 71.202.112.89
Case Number: 3:2015cv05398
Filed: November 24, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED PROCEDURE FOR EFFECTUATING SERVICE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/23/16. (dlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
February 8, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 3/10/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/8/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
January 26, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE by Hon. William Alsup [Granting 8 Ex Parte Application].(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
December 13, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Statement due by 2/25/2016. Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/3/15. All counsel are required to download, read and follow Judge Alsup's SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE", available at http://cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/13/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 71.202.112.89
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Brenna Elsie Erlbaum
Represented By: Brian Morgan Heit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 71.202.112.89
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?