Hoyt et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Raymond L. Hoyt and Marjorie A. Hoyt
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Bank of America , N.A. and Western Progressive, LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv05422
Filed: November 25, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 17, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 25 Motion to Dismiss.(vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
April 28, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE EMAIL FROM PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/28/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
April 13, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria re 28 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Marjorie A. Hoyt, Raymond L. Hoyt, 29 MOTION to perpetuate testimony filed by Marjorie A. Hoyt, Raymond L. Hoyt (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
December 29, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING OSC AND DIRECTING CLERK OF COURT TO REASSIGN CASE WITH REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Objections due by 1/12/2016. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/29/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2015)
December 17, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/14/2016 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 12/31/2015. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/17/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
December 9, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF RAYMOND HOYT'S REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT TO DISTRICT COURT JUDGE; ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFFS TO CONTACT ADR DEPARTMENT RE: ASSESSMENT CONFERENCE. PLAINTIFFS ARE ADVISED THIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE IF THEY DO NOT CONTACT THE ADR DEPARTMENT BY 12/16/2015. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/9/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2015)
December 2, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/2/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
November 25, 2015 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Notice Regarding Resources Available to Pro Se Litigants. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/25/15. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoyt et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond L. Hoyt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie A. Hoyt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America , N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Progressive, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?