Google Inc. v. Eolas Technologies Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Google Inc.
Defendant: Eolas Technologies Incorporated and Regents of the University of California
Case Number: 3:2015cv05446
Filed: November 25, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2017 96 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 94 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reflect Name Change from Google Inc. to Google LLC filed by Google LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 11, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2017)
January 3, 2017 85 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 84 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 83 Order> filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 3, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
June 16, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS AS MODIFIED by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 37 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
April 15, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 61 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER MOVING APRIL 21, 2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON EOLAS'S MOTION TO DISMISS TO NEW DATE filed by Google Inc. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/16/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 15, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
April 13, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE STIPULATION TO MOVE APRIL 21, 2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 59 Stipulation, filed by Google Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 13, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
March 8, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Reply to Google Inc.'s Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 8, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
February 23, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 50 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Eolas Technologies Incorporated's Motion to Dismiss Google Inc.'s Complaint (Dkt. 37) filed by Google Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 23, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
February 18, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 46 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Google Inc. filed by Google Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 18, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
February 12, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE STIPULATION SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 43 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Google Inc. filed by Google Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 12, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Google Inc. v. Eolas Technologies Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Google Inc.
Represented By: Lindsay Cooper
Represented By: Felipe Corredor
Represented By: David Andrew Perlson
Represented By: Michael D. Powell
Represented By: Derek J. Tang
Represented By: Charles Kramer Verhoeven
Represented By: Jonathan K. Waldrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eolas Technologies Incorporated
Represented By: Kevin Lee Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regents of the University of California
Represented By: Kevin Lee Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?