Franklin v. Facebook, Inc.

Plaintiff: Ricky R Franklin
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv05448
Filed: November 27, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 44 REQUEST TO VACATE ALL DEADLINES.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
January 11, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 42 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/26/15. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
January 4, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FACEBOOK, INC. TO RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT 40 .(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
December 16, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 36 MOTION FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC CASE FILING.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky R Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew B. Clubok
Represented By: Kristin Sheffield-Whitehead
Represented By: Kristin I Sheffield-Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?