Hallmark American Insurance Company v. Tom Wasson, et al
Plaintiff: Hallmark American Insurance Company
Defendant: Tom Wasson, Ronald C. Broyles and Jean O. Broyles
Case Number: 3:2015cv05536
Filed: December 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 56 Amended Stipulation for Dismissal. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/11/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/13/2017 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 4/6/2017. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/28/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017)
January 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re briefing and trial. Bench Trial set for 3/1/2017 at 10:00 AM before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/13/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2017)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER VACATING TRIAL DATE AND REQUESTING FURTHER BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/8/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 24 in part Motion for Summary Judgment. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2016)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER To Reset Hearing, Response, and Reply dates on Motion for Summary Judgment and reset Trial Date. Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Pretrial Co nference set for 12/15/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Bench Trial set for 1/9/2017 at 10:00 AM before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/21/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER, Case referred to early neutral evaluation. Bench Trial set for 9/26/2016 at 09:00 AM before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Pretrial Conference set for 9/15/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/10/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 12 FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT TOM WASSON DBA TOM'S AIRCRAFT ENTERPRISE, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ONLY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/11/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hallmark American Insurance Company v. Tom Wasson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Wasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald C. Broyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean O. Broyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hallmark American Insurance Company
Represented By: John R. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?