Petrov v. The United States Department of Health and Human Services

Plaintiff: Alisa Petrov
Defendant: The United States Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 3:2015cv05552
Filed: December 4, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1402
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE PRE-SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Pre-Settlement Confernece filed by Alisa Petrov Scheduling Conference set for 8/25/2016 02:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 6/27/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
May 27, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER for Bench Trial by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. A Pretrial Conference is set for 10/10/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The Bench Trial shall begin on 10/30/2017 at 8:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
March 7, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Request for Continuance of Case Management Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 12 Request. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petrov v. The United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisa Petrov
Represented By: Robert Griggs Schock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?