Keyhan v. Kohler Co.

Plaintiff: Ladan Keyhan
Defendant: Kohler Co.
Case Number: 3:2015cv05555
Filed: December 4, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/21/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
March 9, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 9 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/9/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
December 21, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/25/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/21/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keyhan v. Kohler Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ladan Keyhan
Represented By: Jason M. Erlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohler Co.
Represented By: Rachel Jan Moroski
Represented By: Victoria L. Tallman
Represented By: Michael Neil Westheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?