Parker v. Selland Auto Transport, Inc.

Plaintiff: Garland Parker
Defendant: Selland Auto Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv05635
Filed: December 9, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO REMAND filed by Selland Auto Transport, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/20/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
March 8, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRAL CASE FOR PRIVATE MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/7/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
March 7, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 19 REQUESTING CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, EXTENSION OF CURRENT DEADLINE TO CONDUCT THE PARTIES RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE AND TO FILE THE CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Garland Parker. Case Management Statement due by 7/14/2016. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 7/21/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/6/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Selland Auto Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garland Parker
Represented By: David Thomas Mara
Represented By: William David Turley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selland Auto Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry McCoy Friedrichs
Represented By: Selyn Hong
Represented By: Fraser Angus McAlpine
Represented By: Francis J. Ortman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?