Silver et al v. 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jasen Silver and Robert Burke
Defendant: 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv05643
Filed: December 10, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 32 Stipulation to Extend Time to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/7/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
March 14, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 24 STIPULATION selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/14/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
February 18, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT: Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/11/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/18/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
February 16, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/16/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silver et al v. 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasen Silver
Represented By: Reuben D. Nathan
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Burke
Represented By: Reuben D. Nathan
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?