Lundy v. Selene Finance, LP et al

Plaintiff: John F. Lundy
Defendant: Selene Finance, LP, MTC Financial dba Trustee Corps, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A, Bank of America , N.A. and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Case Number: 3:2015cv05676
Filed: December 11, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2017 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR LACK OF STANDING re 114 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT [Fed.R.Civ.P. 56] filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Selene Finance, LP. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 20, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
May 8, 2017 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 5/15/2017. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 8, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2017)
February 7, 2017 113 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 112 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF CAUSE OF ACTION: VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE SECTION 2923.55(a) and 55(b)(1)(B) filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Selene Finance, LP. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 7, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
December 20, 2016 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY CUTOFF DATE PREVIOUSLY SET PER SCHEDULING ORDER ISSUED BY THE COURT ON JULY 25, 2016 re 110 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Selene Finance, LP. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 20, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
July 25, 2016 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MODIFYING ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL; SCHEDULING ORDER. Deadline to amend the complaint 8/1/2016. Deadline to amend the answer 1/3/2017. Fact discovery cut-off 1/20/2017. Expert disclosures 2/10/2017. Expert rebuttal 3/3/201 7. Expert discovery cut-off 3/17/2017. Deadline to file dispositive motions 4/7/2017. Pretrial conference statement due 6/20/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 7/24/2017 - 7/31/2017 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 25, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
July 21, 2016 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re 102 Notice of Settlement filed by John F. Lundy. Stipulation of Dismissal or Statement due by 9/5/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 21, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
July 13, 2016 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re 95 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by John F. Lundy. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 13, 2016. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016)
June 8, 2016 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 92 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by John F. Lundy. Amended Pleadings due by 7/9/2016. Case Management Statement due by 7/20/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/27/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 8, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
May 9, 2016 90 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 89 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by John F. Lundy. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 9, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
April 26, 2016 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2016)
April 21, 2016 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 75 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 21, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
April 12, 2016 80 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 79 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Selene Finance, LP, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Selene Finance, LP. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 12, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
March 31, 2016 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS re 76 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by John F. Lundy. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 31, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
March 18, 2016 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 4/13/2016. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/27/2016 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 18, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
March 17, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND DENYING MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion to Dismiss; denying 28 Motion TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 15, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY re 69 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by John F. Lundy. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 15, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
February 8, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING AND BRIEFING DEADLINES ON MOTION TO DISMISS re 45 Stipulation filed by John F. Lundy. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 8, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
February 1, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT MTC FINANCIAL INC. dba TRUSTEE CORPS' MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-2 re 41 Stipulation filed by John F. Lundy. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 1, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
January 5, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Hon. Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/5/16. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lundy v. Selene Finance, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John F. Lundy
Represented By: Mark Whitney Lapham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selene Finance, LP
Represented By: Ruby Chavez
Represented By: Gwen Heather Ribar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Financial dba Trustee Corps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A
Represented By: Joseph Edward Addiego, III
Represented By: John Douglas Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America , N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Ruby Chavez
Represented By: Gwen Heather Ribar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?