Rossmann v. Letteer

Plaintiff: Brud Rossmann
Defendant: Ray Letteer
Case Number: 3:2015cv05680
Filed: December 10, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 17, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/17/16. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
January 5, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 2/4/2016 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 1/19/2016. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/5/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
December 16, 2015 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE FURTHER INFORMATION IN SUPPORT OF FEE WAIVER APPLICATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/16/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rossmann v. Letteer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brud Rossmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Letteer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?