John Muir Health v. Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield

Plaintiff: John Muir Health
Defendant: Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield
Case Number: 3:2015cv05730
Filed: December 14, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER UPON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 56 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2016)
May 16, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/16/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
May 3, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting 49 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
April 21, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS re 30 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Wal-mart Stores Inc Associates' Health and Welfare Plan, USAble Mutual Insurance Company Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/9/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/21/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
April 7, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/7/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
March 14, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER UPON STIPULATION TO AMEND THE MOTION TO DISMISS BRIEFING SCHEDULE, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 30 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Responses due by 3/29/2016. Replies due by 4/5/2016. Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/14/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
February 10, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR BLUEADVANTAGE TO RESPOND TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/10/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
February 9, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT AND REQUESTING RESPONSE FROM PLAINTIFF by Hon. William Alsup finding as moot 15 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2016)
February 8, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR RESPONSE Responses due by 2/11/2016 at NOON.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/8/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
February 4, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 19 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/11/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
January 13, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/13/16. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Muir Health v. Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Muir Health
Represented By: Jennifer Jiao
Represented By: Richard Alan Lovich
Represented By: Karlene Jasmine Rogers-Aberman
Represented By: Joy Young Stephenson
Represented By: Barry Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield
Represented By: J. Gordon Howard
Represented By: Thomas H. Lawrence
Represented By: Jeremy Seth Millstone
Represented By: Glenn William Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?