L.H. et al v. Mill Valley School District

Plaintiff: L. H., Mike Huff and Kelly Huff
Defendant: Mill Valley School District
Case Number: 3:2015cv05751
Filed: December 15, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 45 Motion for Settlement. The court grants the petition to approve the settlement. The court also sets a case-management conference for February 16, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
January 9, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 42 Joint Consent to Reference of Case to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017)
June 7, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S 14 MOTION TO DISMISS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L.H. et al v. Mill Valley School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. H.
Represented By: Jay Toivo Jambeck
Represented By: Mandy G. Leigh
Represented By: Nathan Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Huff
Represented By: Jay Toivo Jambeck
Represented By: Mandy G. Leigh
Represented By: Nathan Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Huff
Represented By: Jay Toivo Jambeck
Represented By: Mandy G. Leigh
Represented By: Nathan Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mill Valley School District
Represented By: Katherine A. Alberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?