Center for Biological Diversity et al v. U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service et al

Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity and Environmental Protection Information Center
Defendant: U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service, Sally Jewell and Daniel M. Ashe
Case Number: 3:2015cv05754
Filed: December 16, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1538
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2017 82 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 81 SECOND STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Requesting Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Environmental Protection Information Center. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 4, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
May 12, 2017 73 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 72 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Environmental Protection Information Center. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 12, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2017)
May 3, 2017 71 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 70 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Remedy filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Environmental Protection Information Center. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 3, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
March 28, 2017 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 57 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 59 Motion for Summary Judgment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2017)
September 14, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Adjusting Briefing Schedule filed by Douglas County, Oregon, National Association of Home Builders, Oregon Forest Industries Council, American Forest Resource Council, Siskiyou County, California Forestry Association, Douglas Timber Operators. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 14, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
May 31, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 50 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Daniel M. Ashe, U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service, Sally Jewell. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 31, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
April 7, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO INTERVENE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 13 Motion to Intervene. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
March 23, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Hearing on the parties' motions for summary judgment set for 1/10/2017 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 23, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
March 14, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 13 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support filed by Douglas County, Oregon, National Association of Home Builders, Oregon Forest Industries Council, American Forest Resource Council, Siskiyou County, California Forestry Association, Douglas Timber Operators. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 14, 2016. The Case Management Conference scheduled for 3/23/2016 will remain on calendar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity et al v. U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Gregory C. Loarie
Represented By: Tamara Theresa Zakim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Environmental Protection Information Center
Represented By: Gregory C. Loarie
Represented By: Tamara Theresa Zakim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Jewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel M. Ashe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?