e.Digital Corporation v. MivaTek International, Inc.

Plaintiff: e.Digital Corporation
Defendant: MivaTek International, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv05795
Filed: December 17, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF ALL CLAIMS filed by e.Digital Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 30, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 23, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Changing Time of Defendants' Deadline to Serve Preliminary Invalidity Contentions filed by MivaTek International, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 23, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
April 27, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Deadline to Exchange of Initial Disclosures 4/27/2016. Plaintiff's Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions to include Document Production Accompanying Disclosure 5/11/2016. Deadline for Defendant's Preliminary Invalidity Contentions 6/24/2016. Deadline to Exchange of Proposed Terms for Construction 7/8/2016. Deadline to Exchange of Preliminary Claim Constructions and Identification of Extrinsic Evidence 7/29/2016. Deadline to File Joint Cla im Construction and Prehearing Statement 8/19/2016. Claim Construction Discovery Ends 9/16/2016. Opening Claim Construction Brief 10/7/2016. Responsive Claim Construction Brief 10/21/2016. Reply Claim Construction Brief 10/28/2016. Tutorial Hear ing set for 11/14/2016 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 11/28/2016 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 27, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2016)
April 7, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 20 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by e.Digital Corporation and MivaTek International, Inc. filed by e.Digital Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 7, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
February 19, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME OF DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, TIME OF THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT, AND TIME OF THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED O RDER CHANGING TIME OF DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT, TIME OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND TIME OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by e.Digital Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 19, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: e.Digital Corporation v. MivaTek International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: e.Digital Corporation
Represented By: Anton N Handal
Represented By: Gabriel Hedrick
Represented By: Lauren Gail Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MivaTek International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?